Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Estaña (Stania)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia

Titular Bishop of Christopolis


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Dec 1534AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
16 Dec 1534AppointedTitular Bishop of Christopolis
16 May 1535Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Christopolis
23 Jun 1549DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Estaña (Stania):
Bishop Francisco Estaña (Stania) (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia

  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,383
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 46, Number 241
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 166
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1535, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015