Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jorge de Austria

Deceased

Bishop of Liège, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1504¹Born
9 Apr 152622.2AppointedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
29 Nov 153834.9AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
12 Jan 153935.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 Apr 153935.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
23 Feb 154137.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Liège, Belgium
16 Aug 154440.6SucceededBishop of Liège, Belgium
5 May 155753.3DiedBishop of Liège, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jorge de Austria (VIAF: 74667947)
Archbishop Jorge de Austria (born 1504, died ) Bishop of Liège

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGent
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valencia, Archdiocese of Valencia, Spain

  • a priest for 18.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 50, Number 266
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 141, and Page 325
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 222
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1539, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018