Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Melchor Serrano Lázaro, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain

Titular Bishop of Arca in Armenia

Titular See: (Melchor Serrano de San Nicolás Tolentino)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1738Born
15 Sep 178850.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
15 Sep 178850.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Arca in Armenia
30 Nov 178850.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arca in Armenia
31 Dec 180062.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Melchor Serrano Lázaro
Bishop Melchor Serrano Lázaro Sch. P. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBádenas

  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 96, and Page 452
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1,700, Page 106, Number 550
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,788, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast