Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pedro Cardinal Ferris

Deceased

Bishop of Tarazona, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1415¹Born
1 Oct 146449.4AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
18 Dec 147661.6Elevated to Cardinal
30 Dec 147661.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
25 Sep 147863.4DiedBishop of Tarazona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Ferris
Pedro Cardinal Ferris (born , died ) Bishop of Tarazona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCocentaina, Diocese of Valencia
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 1.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1476
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 251
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,464, Number 27*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast