Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe Guimerá, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Jaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1570¹BornValencia
1609²39.0AppointedMaster General of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
1615²45.0ResignedMaster General of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
30 May 161646.4AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
16 Oct 161646.7Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
24 Jan 161747.0DiedBishop of Jaca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Felipe Guimerá:
Bishop Felipe Guimerá O. de M. (died ) Bishop of Jaca

  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 205
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 132, Number 848
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1616, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Mar 2015