Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Ibáñez y Galiano

Deceased

Bishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1829Born
1853¹23.8Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia, Spain
1855¹25.8IncardinatedPriest of Cartagena (en España)
30 Nov 188051.7SelectedBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
16 Dec 188051.7ConfirmedBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
27 Feb 188151.9Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
21 Jul 189061.3DiedBishop of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Ibáñez y Galiano
Bishop Antonio Ibáñez y Galiano (born , died ) Bishop of Teruel (-Albarracín)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlmansa, Diocese of Cartagena (en España)
Ordained BishopLa Purisima, Church, Yecla

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 543
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017