Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martín López de Hontiveros

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1596BornSalamanca
18 Jun 165761.2AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
24 May 165862.1SelectedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
30 Sep 165862.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
6 Feb 165962.8InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
5 Sep 166670.4DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Martín López de Hontiveros:
Archbishop Martín López de Hontiveros (born , died ) Archbishop of Valencia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 128, and Page 357
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 188, Number 1,180

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 8 Dec 2013