Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Alexander VI

Rodrigo de Borja

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1431¹BornJàtiva
20 Feb 145625.1Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
17 Sep 145625.7Elevated to Cardinal
17 Sep 145625.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
1457²26.0AppointedAdministrator of Gerona, Spain
Jun 1458³27.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
30 Jun 145827.5AppointedAdministrator of Valencia, Spain
21 Jul 145827.6InstalledAdministrator of Valencia, Spain
146837.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 Aug 147140.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
30 Oct 147140.8Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jul 147645.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
8 Jul 148251.5AppointedAdministrator of Cartagena (en España)
9 Oct 148958.8AppointedAdministrator of Mallorca, Spain
1491²60.0AppointedAdministrator of Eger, Hungary
9 Jul 149261.5AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
11 Aug 149261.6ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
26 Aug 149261.7InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
18 Aug 150372.6DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rodrigo de Borja:
Holy Father Rodrigo de Borja (died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 31.8 years
  • a cardinal for 36.5 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 11.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Feb 1456

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013