Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco de Navarra y Hualde

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1498Born
22 May 154244.3AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
14 Dec 154547.9AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
4 May 155658.3AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
22 Jun 155658.4InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
16 Apr 156365.2DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Navarra y Hualde
Archbishop Francisco de Navarra y Hualde (born 1498, died ) Archbishop of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTafalla
Death PlaceTorrente, Archdiocese of Valencia

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 54, Number 297
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 266, and Page 168
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 325
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1542, Number 20*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018