Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pedro Luis Cardinal de Borja Lanzol de Romaní, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1472BornValencia
20 Mar 150028.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
29 Jul 150028.6AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
29 Aug 150028.7InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
28 Sep 150028.7Elevated to Cardinal
5 Oct 150028.8InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
150230.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 150331.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
Jun 151038.4AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
4 Oct 151139.8DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Luis de Borja Lanzol de Romaní:
Cardinal Pedro Luis de Borja Lanzol de Romaní O.S.Io.Hieros. (died ) Archbishop of Valencia

  • a priest for 9.8 years
  • a cardinal for 11.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Mar 1500
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 18, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 10 Nov 2013