Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Acisclo de Moya y Contreras

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1505Born
6 Jul 155449.5AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
9 Dec 155449.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
1 Mar 156459.1AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
24 Apr 156459.3InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
3 May 156459.3DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Acisclo de Moya y Contreras
Archbishop Acisclo de Moya y Contreras (born 1505, died ) Archbishop of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePedroche, Diocese of Córdoba
Ordained BishopSan Martin Chapel, La Seo, Cathedral, Zaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza
Death PlaceMontserrat

  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 65, Number 372
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 332, and Page 325
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1554, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018