Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés de Albalat, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Valencia


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Dec 1248SelectedBishop of Valencia, Spain
25 Feb 1249ConfirmedBishop of Valencia, Spain
25 Nov 1276DiedBishop of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Andrés de Albalat:
Bishop Andrés de Albalat O.P. (died ) Bishop of Valencia

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013