Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrique Benavent Vidal

Bishop of Tortosa, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1959 Born
8 Nov 198223.5Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia, Spain
8 Nov 200445.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
8 Nov 200445.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Rotdon
8 Jan 200545.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rotdon
17 May 201354.0AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain

MicroData Summary for Enrique Benavent Vidal
Bishop Enrique Benavent Vidal (born ) Bishop of Tortosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuatretonda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tortosa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,804
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018