Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Maradei

Deceased

Bishop of Segorbe-Albarracin, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1423Born
21 Nov 149875.0AppointedBishop of Segorbe-Albarracin, Spain
1 Nov 149976.0DiedBishop of Segorbe-Albarracin, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Maradei
Bishop Juan Maradei (born , died ) Bishop of Segorbe-Albarracin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTuriu, Diocese of Valencia
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 234
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1498, Number 52*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 8 Jan 2019

Quantcast