Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Castro Nero

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1541²BornAmpudia
17 Feb 159958.1AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
18 Jul 159958.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
13 Aug 160362.6AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
12 Sep 161170.7AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
28 Sep 161170.7DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Castro Nero:
Archbishop Pedro Castro Nero (died ) Archbishop of Valencia

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 229
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 113, Number 715
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 224, and Page 310
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 357

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 8 Dec 2013