Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Agustín Clavería

Deceased

Bishop of Alghero


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Jul 1631AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
28 Jul 1631AppointedTitular Bishop of Petra in Palaestina
27 Jun 1639AppointedBishop of Bosa, Italy
17 Oct 1644AppointedBishop of Alghero, Italy
1652²DiedBishop of Alghero, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vicente Agustín Clavería:
Bishop Vicente Agustín Clavería , Bishop of Alghero

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 78, and Page 118
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 278
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 154, Number 978

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 7 Jan 2014