Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Suárez de Figueroa

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1533Born
22 Jun 158754.3AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
30 Aug 158754.5Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
26 Mar 159764.1AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
2 Aug 160875.4DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Suárez de Figueroa
Bishop Fernando Suárez de Figueroa (born , died ) Bishop of Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSabiote, Diocese of Jaén
Ordained BishopLa Magdalena, Moniales, Convent, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Death PlaceBaeza

  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,818
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 150, and Page 339
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 100, Number 626
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 376
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,927
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1587, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018