Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Reinoso Baeza

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1534Born
11 Jun 159762.6AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
Oct 1597²62.9Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba, Spain
23 Aug 160166.8DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Reinoso Baeza
Bishop Francisco Reinoso Baeza (born , died ) Bishop of Córdoba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAutillo de Campos, Diocese of Palencia
Ordained BishopDechaux, Convent, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo
Death PlaceCórdoba, Diocese of Córdoba

  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob/c2+/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,155
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 164
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 110, Number 697
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1597, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018