Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Portocarrero

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Mar 1589AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
4 Jun 1589Ordained BishopBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
12 Jan 1594AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
28 May 1597AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
20 Sep 1600DiedBishop of Cuenca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Portocarrero
Bishop Pedro Portocarrero (died ) Bishop of Cuenca

  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 159, and Page 164
  • bp/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 145
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 102, Number 642
  • ob: CB, 7 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Sep 2016