Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Soto Salazar

Deceased

Bishop of Salamanca, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Aug 1571AppointedBishop of Segorbe-Albarracin, Spain
15 Feb 1576AppointedBishop of Salamanca, Spain
21 Jan 1578DiedBishop of Salamanca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Soto Salazar
Bishop Francisco Soto Salazar (died ) Bishop of Salamanca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBonilla de la Sierra, Diocese of ┴vila
Death PlaceLlerena

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1500, Page 82, Number 493
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 296, and Page 289
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1571, Number 15*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018