Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alonso Velázquez

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1533²BornTudela del Duero
13 Jun 157845.4AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
Sep 1578³45.6Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
9 Mar 158350.1AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
14 Jan 158754.0DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alonso Velázquez:
Archbishop Alonso Velázquez (died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 89, Number 546
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 266, and Page 173

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015