Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardo de Fresneda, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1509Born
4 May 156252.7AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
16 Nov 157162.2AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
14 Oct 157768.1AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
22 Dec 157768.3DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo de Fresneda (VIAF: 75177014)
Archbishop Bernardo de Fresneda O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFresneda, Diocese of Burgos
Death PlaceSanto Domingo de la Calzada

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 73, Number 430
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 174, and Page 178
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 144
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1562, Number 19*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018