Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Cardinal de Carvajal

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia, Spain

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1399Born
11 Oct 144344.7AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
10 Aug 144647.6AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
16 Dec 144647.9Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 144647.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
26 Oct 146162.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
6 Dec 146970.9DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Carvajal
Juan Cardinal de Carvajal (born 1399, died ) Bishop of Plasencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrujillo

  • a cardinal for 22.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1446

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018