Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Pius II

Enea Silvio Piccolomini

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1405BornCorsignano
4 Mar 144741.3Ordained PriestPriest
17 Apr 144741.4AppointedBishop of Trieste, Italy
15 Aug 144741.8Ordained BishopBishop of Trieste, Italy
24 Oct 144944.0SelectedBishop of Siena, Italy
23 Sep 145044.9ConfirmedBishop of Siena, Italy
17 Dec 145651.1Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 145651.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
12 Aug 145751.8AppointedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
19 Aug 145852.8ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
3 Sep 145852.8InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
14 Aug 146458.8DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Enea Silvio Piccolomini:
Pope Enea Silvio Piccolomini (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 17.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
  • a cardinal for 1.7 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,370
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1456

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014