Catholic-Hierarchy DC

═˝igo Cardinal Lˇpez de Mendoza y Z˙˝iga

Deceased

Bishop of Burgos, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of San Nicola in Carcere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1489²Born
1528¹39.0AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
1528¹39.0Ordained BishopBishop of Coria, Spain
2 Mar 152940.1AppointedBishop of Burgos, Spain
9 Mar 153041.1Elevated to Cardinal
21 Jun 153142.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Nicola in Carcere
9 Jun 153546.4DiedBishop of Burgos, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for ═˝igo Lˇpez de Mendoza y Z˙˝iga
═˝igo Cardinal Lˇpez de Mendoza y Z˙˝iga (born 1489, died ) Bishop of Burgos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMiranda de Ebro, Diocese of Burgos
Death PlaceTordomar, Diocese of Burgos

  • a bishop for 7.4 years
  • a cardinal for 5.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Mar 1530
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 143, and Page 160
  • b: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1,500, Page 41, Number 200
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,529, Number 4*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast