Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino León de la Rocha

Deceased

Bishop of Coria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1620BornBadajoz
13 Mar 165635.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 166949.0SelectedBishop of Tui, Spain
15 Jul 166949.3ConfirmedBishop of Tui, Spain
25 Sep 167353.5AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
4 Jan 167554.8DiedBishop of Coria, Spain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino León de la Rocha:
Bishop Bernardino León de la Rocha (born , died ) Bishop of Coria

  • a priest for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 152, and Page 394
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 205, Number 1,281

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 4 Nov 2013