Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo Rodríguez de Valderas, O. de M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1592³BornCiudad Rodrigo
17 Apr 166269.8AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
9 Apr 166875.8AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
7 Mar 167178.7DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo Rodríguez de Valderas:
Bishop Jerónimo Rodríguez de Valderas O. de M. (born , died ) Bishop of Jaén

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 269
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 195, Number 1,228
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1663, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015