Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro de Villalobos, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Coria, Spain

Titular Bishop of Berytus


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jul 1475AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Coria, Spain
12 Jul 1475AppointedTitular Bishop of Berytus
30 Jul 1475Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Berytus
1487²DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Coria, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro de Villalobos
Bishop Pedro de Villalobos O.S.A. (died 1487) Auxiliary Bishop of Coria

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlasencia, Diocese of Plasencia
Ordained BishopSacristy, S. Augustin, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,625
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 309, Number 199
  • bp/ab/d: CB, 20 Jul 2014
  • bp/ab/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1475, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast