Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Núñez y Pernía, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Coria, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1810Born
20 Dec 183424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Jun 186857.8SelectedBishop of Coria, Spain
24 Sep 186858.1ConfirmedBishop of Coria, Spain
28 Feb 186958.5Ordained BishopBishop of Coria, Spain
16 Mar 188473.6DiedBishop of Coria, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Núñez y Pernía
Bishop Pedro Núñez y Pernía O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Coria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBenavente
Ordained BishopSt. Martin, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 193
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 39, Number 3
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1869, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018