Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Ortega Bravo de la Laguna

Deceased

Bishop of Coria, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jan 1493AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
6 Sep 1499AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
5 May 1503AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
1517¹DiedBishop of Coria, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Ortega Bravo de la Laguna
Bishop Juan Ortega Bravo de la Laguna (died 1517) Bishop of Coria

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 160
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 114, and Page 123
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 130
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,493, Number 12*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast