Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Figueroa

Deceased

Bishop of Patti

Auxiliary Bishop of Zaragoza


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Sep 1500AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
4 Sep 1500AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zaragoza, Spain
8 Nov 1501Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
10 May 1517DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Miguel Figueroa:
Bishop Miguel Figueroa (died ) Bishop of Patti

  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 266
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 18, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 210

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 10 Nov 2013