Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillermo Ramón de Moncada

Deceased

Bishop of Tarazona, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Oct 1473AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
27 Mar 1493AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
16 Mar 1496AppointedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
16 Jul 1521DiedBishop of Tarazona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Guillermo Ramón de Moncada
Bishop Guillermo Ramón de Moncada (died ) Bishop of Tarazona

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 267, and Page 184
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 251
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,473, Number 41*
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,496, Number 9*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast