Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francisco Cardinal Mendoza Bobadilla

Deceased

Bishop of Burgos

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1508BornCuenca
14 Feb 153324.4AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
19 Dec 154436.2Elevated to Cardinal
4 Dec 154537.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
28 Feb 155041.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
27 Jun 155041.8AppointedBishop of Burgos, Spain
1 Dec 156658.2DiedBishop of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Mendoza Bobadilla:
Cardinal Francisco Mendoza Bobadilla (born , died ) Bishop of Burgos

  • a cardinal for 22.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1544
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 143, and Page 160
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 44, Number 224

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 17 Nov 2013