Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Ramírez de Haro

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Jul 1537AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
2 Dec 1537Ordained BishopBishop of Orense, Spain
18 Aug 1539AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
27 Jun 1541AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
6 Aug 1543AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
16 Sep 1549DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Ramírez de Haro
Bishop Antonio Ramírez de Haro (died ) Bishop of Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillaescusa de Haro, Diocese of Cuenca

  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 48, Number 251
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 124, and Page 168
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 145, and Page 296
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1537, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018