Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Martín Rodríguez, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Coria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1719BornAcebo
13 Dec 177959.9AppointedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
23 Apr 178060.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ceuta, Spain
14 Feb 178565.1AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
4 May 178969.3DiedBishop of Coria, Spain

MicroData Summary for Diego Martín Rodríguez:
Bishop Diego Martín Rodríguez O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Coria

  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 96, Number 495

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015