Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dionisio Moreno y Barrio

Deceased

Bishop of Coria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1879BornBarriosuso de Valdavia
28 May 190424.6Ordained PriestPriest
2 Dec 192748.2AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
11 Mar 192848.4Ordained BishopBishop of Coria, Spain
10 Dec 193455.2DiedBishop of Coria, Spain

MicroData Summary for Dionisio Moreno y Barrio:
Bishop Dionisio Moreno y Barrio (born , died ) Bishop of Coria

  • a priest for 30.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013