Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Wenceslao Manuel Gomez Frande, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Prefect of San Miguel de Sucumbíos, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1900Born
1925²24.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
18 Feb 195555.0AppointedPrefect of San Miguel de Sucumbíos, Ecuador
1 Aug 196868.4DiedPrefect of San Miguel de Sucumbíos, Ecuador

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wenceslao Manuel Gomez Frande (VIAF: 87219752)
Father Wenceslao Manuel Gomez Frande O.C.D. (born , died ) Prefect of San Miguel de Sucumbíos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantander, Diocese of Santander, Spain

  • a priest for 43.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1967
  • b: CB, 22 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 23 Mar 2019

Quantcast