Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Javier Arriaza

Deceased

Bishop of Santander


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1708BornMadrid
24 Sep 175546.9AppointedBishop of Santander, Spain
7 Dec 175547.1Ordained BishopBishop of Santander, Spain
18 Oct 176152.9DiedBishop of Santander, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Arriaza:
Bishop Francisco Javier Arriaza (born , died ) Bishop of Santander

  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 367
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 73, Number 356

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 23 Oct 2013