Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolás Gil Martínez y Malo

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Marta, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1703Born
4 Aug 175551.9AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
4 Jan 175652.3Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
4 Apr 176359.5DiedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Nicolás Gil Martínez y Malo
Bishop Nicolás Gil Martínez y Malo (born , died ) Bishop of Santa Marta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRecuenca, Spain

  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 73, Number 357
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 278

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018