Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Nepomuceno Gómez Durán

Deceased

Bishop of Málaga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1767Born
21 Feb 182052.9AppointedBishop of Santander, Spain
10 Sep 182053.4Ordained BishopBishop of Santander, Spain
11 Apr 182962.0SelectedBishop of Málaga, Spain
27 Jul 182962.3ConfirmedBishop of Málaga, Spain
30 Sep 183063.5DiedBishop of Málaga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Nepomuceno Gómez Durán
Bishop Juan Nepomuceno Gómez Durán (born , died ) Bishop of Málaga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVal de Santo Domingo

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 250, and Page 333
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1,700, Page 139, Number 749
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,820, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast