Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego de Tejada y la Guardia

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1609BornGalilea
31 Jan 165646.9AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
6 May 165849.2AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
24 Jul 166354.4SelectedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
26 Nov 166354.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
13 Jul 166455.4DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Diego de Tejada y la Guardia:
Archbishop Diego de Tejada y la Guardia (born , died ) Archbishop of Burgos

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 124, and Page 151
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 158, and Page 272
  • b: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 187, Number 1,167

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013