Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Esteban Antonio Aguado Rojas

Deceased

Bishop of Pamplona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1729Born
11 Apr 178555.6AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
24 Aug 178555.9Ordained BishopBishop of Pamplona, Spain
20 Feb 179565.4DiedBishop of Pamplona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Esteban Antonio Aguado Rojas
Bishop Esteban Antonio Aguado Rojas (born , died ) Bishop of Pamplona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIllescas

  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 103, Number 534
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 32
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 326

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018