Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pedro Cardinal Pacheco de Villena (Ladrón de Guevara)

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1488BornPuebla de Montalbán
6 Sep 153244.1AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
11 Apr 153748.7AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
21 May 153950.8AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
9 Jan 154556.5AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
16 Dec 154557.4Elevated to Cardinal
10 Mar 155061.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
30 Apr 155465.8AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
20 Sep 155769.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
5 Mar 156071.6DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Pacheco de Villena (Ladrón de Guevara):
Pedro Cardinal Pacheco de Villena (Ladrón de Guevara) (born , died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

  • a cardinal for 14.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1545
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 43, Number 219
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 245, and Page 268
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 203, and Page 168
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 296

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015