Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Ruffo de Theodoli

Deceased

Archbishop of Cosenza, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Apr 1505AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
6 Nov 1511AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
1512AppointedApostolic Administrator of Pamplona, Spain
1517CeasedApostolic Administrator of Pamplona, Spain
8 Sep 1523AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cádiz, Spain
6 Sep 1525CeasedApostolic Administrator of Cádiz, Spain
1527²DiedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Ruffo de Theodoli
Archbishop Giovanni Ruffo de Theodoli (died 1527) Archbishop of Cosenza

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 139, and Page 183
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 22, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018