Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Schio

Deceased

Bishop of Vaison, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1481¹Born
6 Feb 152342.0AppointedBishop of Vaison, France
7 Dec 152342.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vaison, France
2 Jan 153352.0DiedBishop of Vaison, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Schio (VIAF: 45359369)
Bishop Girolamo Schio (born 1481, died ) Bishop of Vaison

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Onofrio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 327
  • b/c2+: CB, 19 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018