Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Manrique Valencia

Deceased

Bishop of Pamplona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1519¹Born
28 Feb 157556.1AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
26 Jun 157556.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pamplona, Spain
19 Dec 157758.9DiedBishop of Pamplona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Manrique Valencia
Bishop Antonio Manrique Valencia (born 1519, died ) Bishop of Pamplona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZamora, Diocese of Zamora
Ordained BishopCathedral, Pamplona, Diocese of Pamplona

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 85, Number 520
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 268
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1575, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018