Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro del Frago Garcés

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1498¹Born
6 Nov 156264.8AppointedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
4 Jul 156365.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
20 Dec 156668.9AppointedBishop of Alghero, Italy
26 Nov 157274.9AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
11 Sep 157779.6AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
2 Feb 158486.0DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro del Frago Garcés (VIAF: 88929781)
Bishop Pedro del Frago Garcés (born 1498, died ) Bishop of Huesca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUncastillo, Diocese of Jaca
Ordained BishopTrento, Diocese of Trento, Italy

  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,886
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 74, Number 434
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 324, and Page 104
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 214, and Page 264
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1563, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018