Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Gerolamo Cardinal Morone (Moroni)

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1509BornMilano
7 Apr 152920.2AppointedBishop of Modena, Italy
12 Jan 153324.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jan 153324.0Ordained BishopBishop of Modena, Italy
2 Jun 154233.4Elevated to Cardinal
16 Oct 154233.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
25 Feb 154940.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
23 May 155041.3ResignedBishop of Modena, Italy
12 Sep 155243.6AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
11 Dec 155243.9InstalledBishop of Novara, Italy
11 Dec 155344.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
12 Jun 155647.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
13 Mar 156051.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
13 Mar 156051.1ResignedBishop of Novara, Italy
10 Mar 156152.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
18 May 156253.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
23 Feb 156455.1AppointedBishop of Modena, Italy
12 May 156455.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
7 Feb 156556.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
3 Jul 157061.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
16 Nov 157162.8ResignedBishop of Modena, Italy
1 Dec 158071.9DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Gerolamo Morone (Moroni):
Giovanni Gerolamo Cardinal Morone (Moroni) (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 47.9 years
  • a cardinal for 38.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Jun 1542
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 260
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,345

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Mar 2014