Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pompeo Zambeccari

Deceased

Bishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1518¹Born
1 Jul 154729.5AppointedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
3 Apr 154830.2Ordained BishopBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
Mar 155032.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
6 Jul 156042.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
8 Aug 157153.6DiedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pompeo Zambeccari
Bishop Pompeo Zambeccari (born 1518, died ) Bishop of Valva e Sulmona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Diocese of Bologna
Ordained BishopCorpus Christi, Monastery, Bologna, Diocese of Bologna
Death PlaceL’Aquila, Diocese of L’Aquila
Buried Place (Original)Santo Spirito d’Ocre, Abbey, L’Aquila, Diocese of L’Aquila

  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 326
  • ob/c2: CB, 21 Mar 2014
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 293
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1548, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast