Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raoul Rousselet

Deceased

Bishop of Laon


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Feb 1311AppointedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
2 Mar 1317AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
18 Jun 1317AppointedBishop of Laon, France
16 Oct 1323DiedBishop Emeritus of Laon, France

MicroData Summary for Raoul Rousselet:
Bishop Raoul Rousselet (died ) Bishop of Laon

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 319, and Page 387
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 296
  • ob/c2: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 301, Number 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 30 Jan 2014